THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:36:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of London, 1969
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: c/o Dr. M. Kamyar
5987 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON M4N 1B5
Date Received: 21 Apr 2017

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GERMAN
Medical School: University of London, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: c/o Dr. M. Kamyar
5987 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON M4N 1B5
Date Received: 21 Apr 2017

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 11 Sep 2017
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. John Leslie Bart to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 11, 2017:


The College received an assessment report that raised concerns about Dr. Bart’s medical recordkeeping and inadequate physical examination and investigations. In the face of these concerns, Dr. Bart resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 11 Sep 2017
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. John Leslie Bart to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 11, 2017:


The College received an assessment report that raised concerns about Dr. Bart’s medical recordkeeping and inadequate physical examination and investigations. In the face of these concerns, Dr. Bart resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. 

Training

Medical School: University of London, 1969

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1974
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 1974