THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 04:09:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad de Buenos Aires Facultad de Medicina, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 University Avenue
The Hospital for Sick Children
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4168131500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 20 Sha'arei Tora Street
Clalit Health Service
Otolaryngology Clinics
Jerusalem Jerusalem District Israel
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidad de Buenos Aires Facultad de Medicina, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 University Avenue
The Hospital for Sick Children
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4168131500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 20 Sha'arei Tora Street
Clalit Health Service
Otolaryngology Clinics
Jerusalem Jerusalem District Israel
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALESSANDRA MARIA CATALDO RUSSOMANDO may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. CATALDO RUSSOMANDO is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. CATALDO RUSSOMANDO shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CATALDO RUSSOMANDO is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. CATALDO RUSSOMANDO shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. CATALDO RUSSOMANDO ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. CATALDO RUSSOMANDO ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 22 September, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALESSANDRA MARIA CATALDO RUSSOMANDO may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. CATALDO RUSSOMANDO is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. CATALDO RUSSOMANDO shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CATALDO RUSSOMANDO is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. CATALDO RUSSOMANDO shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. CATALDO RUSSOMANDO ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. CATALDO RUSSOMANDO ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 22 September, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad de Buenos Aires Facultad de Medicina, 2013
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
01 Jul 2025 to 22 Sep 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
15 Dec 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
20 Sep 2024 to 14 Dec 2024
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 22 Sep 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
DATE: 15 Dec 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
DATE: 20 Sep 2024 to 14 Dec 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 22 Sep 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 22 Sep 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2024