THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:17:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1973
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 15 Nov 1977
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 1977
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Records Management Ltd.
1 High Meadow Place Unit 13 Toronto ON M9L 0A3

Patients looking to obtain copies of the medical charts should contact toll free: 1-800-775 0093 or [email protected]
Date Received: 10 Jul 2020

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 15 Nov 1977
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 1977
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Records Management Ltd.
1 High Meadow Place Unit 13 Toronto ON M9L 0A3

Patients looking to obtain copies of the medical charts should contact toll free: 1-800-775 0093 or [email protected]
Date Received: 10 Jul 2020

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 10 Aug 2016
Summary:
Update: As of July 20, 2018, Dr. Nolan has completed all elements of this SCERP.
 
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 10 Aug 2016
Summary:
Update: As of July 20, 2018, Dr. Nolan has completed all elements of this SCERP.
 
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1973

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 25 Nov 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 07 Apr 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 May 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1974
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 25 Nov 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Oct 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 07 Apr 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 May 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 20 May 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 2003

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Feb 1988
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Feb 1988

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jul 1974

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1974

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1973