THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/04/25 18:44:13 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Jinnah Sindh Medical University, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster University Downtown Centre
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Jinnah Sindh Medical University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster University Downtown Centre
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHEEMA QARNI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. QARNI is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. QARNI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. QARNI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. QARNI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. QARNI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. QARNI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 31 August, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHEEMA QARNI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. QARNI is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. QARNI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. QARNI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. QARNI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. QARNI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. QARNI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 31 August, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Jinnah Sindh Medical University, 2012
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - General Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2025 to 31 Aug 2025
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - General Internal Medicine
24 Nov 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
McMaster University
PEAP - CF - General Internal Medicine
01 Sep 2024 to 23 Nov 2024
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - General Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 31 Aug 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - General Internal Medicine
DATE: 24 Nov 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - General Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Sep 2024 to 23 Nov 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 31 Aug 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 31 Aug 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2024