THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 03:37:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saigon, 1960
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, VIETNAMESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 01 Jan 1973
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1973
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. San Duy Nguyen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Feb 2023

Corporation Name: San Nguyen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, VIETNAMESE
Medical School: University of Saigon, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 01 Jan 1973
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1973
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. San Duy Nguyen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Feb 2023

Corporation Name: San Nguyen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saigon, 1960

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1974
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 1974