THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:10:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1973
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Jan 1978
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital, 166 Brock Street, Kingston, ON K7L 5G2
Date Received: 16 Jun 2015

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: William T. Depew Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Apr 2015

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Jan 1978
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital, 166 Brock Street, Kingston, ON K7L 5G2
Date Received: 16 Jun 2015

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: William T. Depew Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Apr 2015

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1973
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
No information available

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 17 Jun 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 1974
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1973
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Sep 1974

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1973