THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:21:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1970
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 239 Dovercourt Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7H3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 728-8182
Fax: (613) 728-8182

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 01 Jan 1974
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1974
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eric Knight Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 Oct 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 239 Dovercourt Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7H3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 728-8182
Fax: (613) 728-8182

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 01 Jan 1974
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1974
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eric Knight Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 Oct 2024

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
08 May 2013
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 08 2013
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from May 8, 2013, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Eric Knight, in
accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Knight to the College
of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

Dr. Knight has relinquished his prescribing privileges with respect to
all narcotics and narcotic preparations.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from May 8, 2013, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Eric Knight, in
accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Knight to the College
of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

Dr. Knight has relinquished his prescribing privileges with respect to
all narcotics and narcotic preparations.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1970

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 08 May 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 1975
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 May 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 08 May 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 1975