THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 05:03:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ceylon, 1969
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SINHALESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 05 Mar 1975
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 05 1975
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Records Management Ltd
Unit 13
1 High Meadow Place
Toronto, ON M9L 0A3
Tel: 1 800 775 0093
Date Received: 14 Aug 2014

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wickramasinghe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Aug 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SINHALESE
Medical School: University of Ceylon, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 05 Mar 1975
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 05 1975
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Records Management Ltd
Unit 13
1 High Meadow Place
Toronto, ON M9L 0A3
Tel: 1 800 775 0093
Date Received: 14 Aug 2014

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wickramasinghe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Aug 2021

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ceylon, 1969

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 07 Jun 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1973
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 07 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Apr 1975

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1974

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1973

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1971