THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 06:07:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1974
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 20 Nov 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1981
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 20 Nov 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1981
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1974

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1995
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 26 Oct 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1975
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 1995

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 26 Oct 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1975