THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 06:28:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1974
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Civic Parkdale Clinic
Dermatology Centre, 4th floor
737 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 1J8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 761-4774
Fax: (613) 761-5093

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 26 Nov 1980
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 26 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Walker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Walker (CPSO#: 27420 ) Dr. M. Walker (CPSO#: 31504 )
Business Address: 737 Parkdale Ave
Fourth Floor
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 1J8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Civic Parkdale Clinic
Dermatology Centre, 4th floor
737 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 1J8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 761-4774
Fax: (613) 761-5093

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 26 Nov 1980
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 26 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Walker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Walker (CPSO#: 27420 ) Dr. M. Walker (CPSO#: 31504 )
Business Address: 737 Parkdale Ave
Fourth Floor
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 1J8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES DOUGLAS WALKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALKER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES DOUGLAS WALKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALKER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1974

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 21 Mar 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1975
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1974
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 May 1980

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 21 Mar 1979

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1975

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1974