THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:30:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1974
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Ontario Document Storage (ODS)
PO Box 2071
Sudbury , Ontario
P3A 4R8
Phone: (705) 560-8461
Fax: (705) 524-8012
Email: [email protected]
Date Received: 26 Oct 2012

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alan Vance Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Mar 2013

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Ontario Document Storage (ODS)
PO Box 2071
Sudbury , Ontario
P3A 4R8
Phone: (705) 560-8461
Fax: (705) 524-8012
Email: [email protected]
Date Received: 26 Oct 2012

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alan Vance Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Mar 2013

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1974

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1975
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1975