THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 04:04:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1974
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2 Saint Thomas St
Toronto ON M5S 2Z1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 971-7601
Extension: 300
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1984
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jean Marmoreo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Dec 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Marmoreo (CPSO#: 27493 )
Business Address: 9th Floor
1240 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5R 2A7
(416) 971-7601
Business Address: 2 Saint Thomas St
Toronto ON M5S 2Z1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2 Saint Thomas St
Toronto ON M5S 2Z1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 971-7601
Extension: 300
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1984
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jean Marmoreo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Dec 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Marmoreo (CPSO#: 27493 )
Business Address: 9th Floor
1240 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5R 2A7
(416) 971-7601
Business Address: 2 Saint Thomas St
Toronto ON M5S 2Z1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEAN ELEANOR MARMOREO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARMOREO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEAN ELEANOR MARMOREO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARMOREO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1974

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1975
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 1975