THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:43:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1968
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 11 Nov 1975
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 11 1975
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 11 Nov 1975
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 11 1975
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1968

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 14 Sep 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2002
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 02 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1972
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1968
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2002

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 1975

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1972

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1968