THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/05/25 03:52:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Institute Medicine, Pharmacy,Timisoara, 1962
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN, ROMANIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Manole Buruiana Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Nov 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN, ROMANIAN
Medical School: Institute Medicine, Pharmacy,Timisoara, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Manole Buruiana Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Nov 2019

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Institute Medicine, Pharmacy,Timisoara, 1962

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Member Deceased Effective: 30 Dec 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 2021
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Nov 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1975
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 1973
DETAILS: Expired: Member Deceased
Date: Effective: 30 Dec 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 May 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2019


DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 1975

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jan 1973