THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 03:50:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1974
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 20 Nov 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Dolan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 May 2020

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 20 Nov 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Dolan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 May 2020

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1974

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 19 Dec 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 17 Nov 1982
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1975
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jul 1986

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 1982

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 1975