THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:08:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1974
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1977
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1977
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Contact above direct
Record Storage & Retrieval Services
111 St. Regis Crescent S
Toronto ON M3J 1Y6
416 398 0638
Date Received: 19 Aug 2015

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1977
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1977
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Contact above direct
Record Storage & Retrieval Services
111 St. Regis Crescent S
Toronto ON M3J 1Y6
416 398 0638
Date Received: 19 Aug 2015

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1974

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 04 Apr 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1975
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 04 Apr 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 1975