THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:21:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of London, 1963
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical records can be advised that charts remain with the clinic that Dr. Bowdler saw the patient at.
Date Received: 30 Jul 2013

Instructions/Address: Records will remain at the clinic where Dr. Bowdler saw the patient.
Date Received: 30 Jul 2013

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of London, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical records can be advised that charts remain with the clinic that Dr. Bowdler saw the patient at.
Date Received: 30 Jul 2013

Instructions/Address: Records will remain at the clinic where Dr. Bowdler saw the patient.
Date Received: 30 Jul 2013

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of London, 1963

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 03 Jun 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2017
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 10 Aug 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1975
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1967
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Sep 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 1975

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 1967