THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 03:31:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1974
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1978
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 14018 Loyalist Pkwy
R R 1
Picton, Ontario
K0K 2T0
C/O Dr. Noah Walman
5-389 Main Street
Picton, Ontario
K0K 2T0
Date Received: 02 Sep 2020

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1978
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 14018 Loyalist Pkwy
R R 1
Picton, Ontario
K0K 2T0
C/O Dr. Noah Walman
5-389 Main Street
Picton, Ontario
K0K 2T0
Date Received: 02 Sep 2020

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1974
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
No information available

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 02 Sep 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1975
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Aug 1975

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1974