THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:24:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1974
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 22 Nov 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: Bridgepoint Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 22 Nov 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: Bridgepoint Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EARL RAPHAEL BOGOCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOGOCH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EARL RAPHAEL BOGOCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOGOCH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1974

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 14 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 1978
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1975
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Feb 1985

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 1983

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jan 1982

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Apr 1978

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Sep 1975