THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:10:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Sheffield University School of Medicine and Biomedical Sciences, 1968
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 807
123 Edward Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 408-1010
Fax: (416) 408-2828
Address: Suite 401
1366 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4T 3A7
Phone: (416) 966-0178
Fax: (416) 929-0843

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 04 Dec 1981
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 14 Nov 1977
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Rheumatology
Effective: 23 Nov 1976
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1977
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 1976
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Sheffield University School of Medicine and Biomedical Sciences, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 807
123 Edward Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 408-1010
Fax: (416) 408-2828
Address: Suite 401
1366 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4T 3A7
Phone: (416) 966-0178
Fax: (416) 929-0843

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 04 Dec 1981
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 14 Nov 1977
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Rheumatology
Effective: 23 Nov 1976
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1977
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 1976
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DOREEN JOYCE CAMPBELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMPBELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DOREEN JOYCE CAMPBELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMPBELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Sheffield University School of Medicine and Biomedical Sciences, 1968

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1975
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 1975