THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 03:45:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1972
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1988
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Nov 1987
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1988
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Nov 1987
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1972

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 26 Jul 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 1975
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 26 Jul 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Oct 1975