THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:33:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1974
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 26 Nov 1980
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 26 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Phone #: 1-888-563-3732
SRS
111 Saint Regis Cres S
North York, ON
M3J 1Y6
Date Received: 01 Jul 2021

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. James Mahoney Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Sep 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 26 Nov 1980
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 26 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Phone #: 1-888-563-3732
SRS
111 Saint Regis Cres S
North York, ON
M3J 1Y6
Date Received: 01 Jul 2021

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. James Mahoney Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Sep 2021

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1974

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 02 Jul 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 1975
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1974
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 2021


DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Oct 1975

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1974