THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:26:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1974
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 247 Simcoe Street North #302
Oshawa Ontario L1G 4T3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 576-5451
Fax: (905) 576-8241

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 22 Nov 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 01 Jan 1979
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pierre A. Coutu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Coutu (CPSO#: 27926 )
Business Address: 247 Simcoe Street North
Unit 302
Oshawa Ontario L1G 7T3
(905) 576-5451

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 247 Simcoe Street North #302
Oshawa Ontario L1G 4T3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 576-5451
Fax: (905) 576-8241

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 22 Nov 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 01 Jan 1979
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pierre A. Coutu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Coutu (CPSO#: 27926 )
Business Address: 247 Simcoe Street North
Unit 302
Oshawa Ontario L1G 7T3
(905) 576-5451

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PIERRE ADRIEN COUTU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COUTU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PIERRE ADRIEN COUTU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COUTU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1974

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 1975
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 1975