THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:47:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1974
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1976
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1976
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: St. Lawrence Health Centre
3 - 140 The Esplanade
Toronto, ON M5A 4P5
Date Received: 13 May 2020

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gora Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1976
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1976
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: St. Lawrence Health Centre
3 - 140 The Esplanade
Toronto, ON M5A 4P5
Date Received: 13 May 2020

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gora Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1974

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 1975
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 1975

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1974