THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:32:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: George Washington University, 1974
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, IBO

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1980
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: ODS
P.O. Box 2071
Sudbury, ON P3A 4R8
Telephone: 705-560-8461
Email: [email protected]
Date Received: 07 Apr 2015

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Uduma Kalu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Jul 2015

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, IBO
Medical School: George Washington University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1980
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: ODS
P.O. Box 2071
Sudbury, ON P3A 4R8
Telephone: 705-560-8461
Email: [email protected]
Date Received: 07 Apr 2015

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Uduma Kalu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Jul 2015

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 30 Apr 2015
Summary:
Dr. Kalu has agreed to resign from the College as of April 30, 2015 and has agreed never to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 30 Apr 2015
Summary:
Dr. Kalu has agreed to resign from the College as of April 30, 2015 and has agreed never to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.

Training

Medical School: George Washington University, 1974

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 30 Apr 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1976
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Feb 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Quality Assurance Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Feb 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1976

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1974