THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:38:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1974
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1976
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1976
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: The Arbour Medical Centre
281 Stone Rd. E.
Guelph, ON N1G 5J5
Date Received: 05 Jun 2020

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.C. Mackie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Jul 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1976
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1976
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: The Arbour Medical Centre
281 Stone Rd. E.
Guelph, ON N1G 5J5
Date Received: 05 Jun 2020

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.C. Mackie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Jul 2021

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1974
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
No information available

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 1976
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1974
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Feb 1976

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1974