THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:13:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National Taiwan University, 1972
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: DocuDavit Solutions
28 Eugene Street
Toronto, Ontario
M6B 3Z4

Tel: (416) 781-9083
Toll Free: 1-888-781-9083
Fax: 1-866-297-9338
Website: http://www.docudavit.com
Date Received: 02 May 2007

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE
Medical School: National Taiwan University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: DocuDavit Solutions
28 Eugene Street
Toronto, Ontario
M6B 3Z4

Tel: (416) 781-9083
Toll Free: 1-888-781-9083
Fax: 1-866-297-9338
Website: http://www.docudavit.com
Date Received: 02 May 2007

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Discipline
Effective Date: 22 Aug 2006
Summary:
The College withdrew the allegations before the Discipline Committee on April 30, 2007.

Note: On August 22, 2006, Dr. Henry Shiu-Yuen Au entered into the following Undertaking with the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

1. I, Dr. Henry Shiu-Yuen Au, by entering into this undertaking, do not agree with and deny all of the allegations contained in the Notice of Hearing dated March 31, 2004.

2. I, Dr. Henry Shiu-Yuen Au, acknowledge that, in consideration for this undertaking, the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario agrees to withdraw the referral to the Discipline Committee for sexual abuse, sexual impropriety and disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional conduct, as alleged in the Notice of Hearing dated March 31, 2004.

3. I, Dr. Henry Shiu-Yuen Au, was acquitted by the Superior Court of Justice of the allegations that are the subject of the Notice of Hearing dated March 31, 2004, on September 1, 2005. The jury was unable to reach a verdict on one count, which count was subsequently stayed on June 20, 2006. The acquittals are currently under appeal.

4. I, Dr. Henry Shiu-Yuen Au, undertake to resign from the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario no later than March 31, 2007, and in the interim agree to continue to comply with the terms of the interim order dated August 13, 2002 which took effect on August 19, 2002.

5. I, Dr. Henry Shiu-Yuen Au, undertake not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician or for a license to practise medicine in any jurisdiction.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Discipline
Effective Date: 22 Aug 2006
Summary:
The College withdrew the allegations before the Discipline Committee on April 30, 2007.

Note: On August 22, 2006, Dr. Henry Shiu-Yuen Au entered into the following Undertaking with the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

1. I, Dr. Henry Shiu-Yuen Au, by entering into this undertaking, do not agree with and deny all of the allegations contained in the Notice of Hearing dated March 31, 2004.

2. I, Dr. Henry Shiu-Yuen Au, acknowledge that, in consideration for this undertaking, the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario agrees to withdraw the referral to the Discipline Committee for sexual abuse, sexual impropriety and disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional conduct, as alleged in the Notice of Hearing dated March 31, 2004.

3. I, Dr. Henry Shiu-Yuen Au, was acquitted by the Superior Court of Justice of the allegations that are the subject of the Notice of Hearing dated March 31, 2004, on September 1, 2005. The jury was unable to reach a verdict on one count, which count was subsequently stayed on June 20, 2006. The acquittals are currently under appeal.

4. I, Dr. Henry Shiu-Yuen Au, undertake to resign from the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario no later than March 31, 2007, and in the interim agree to continue to comply with the terms of the interim order dated August 13, 2002 which took effect on August 19, 2002.

5. I, Dr. Henry Shiu-Yuen Au, undertake not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician or for a license to practise medicine in any jurisdiction.

Training

Medical School: National Taiwan University, 1972

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Apr 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Executive Committee. Effective: 19 Aug 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 1976
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2007

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Executive Committee.
Date: Effective: 19 Aug 2002

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2002
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Executive Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 1976