THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:25:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1974
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 29 Nov 1978
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: For charts of patients seen prior to 2013, and any third party reports irrespective of when the patient was seen, requests must be emailed to: [email protected] The request should include their contact info, and reference Account # KTB020997. For charts only, patients from 2013 onwards may contact Trillium Health Partners at 905-848-7181 or send an email to [email protected].
Date Received: 19 Aug 2020

Instructions/Address: Patients prior to 2013 must email a request to: [email protected]
The request should include their contact info, and reference Account # KTB020997.

Patients from 2013 onwards may contact Trillium Health Partners at 905-848-7181 or send an email to [email protected].
Date Received: 14 Apr 2020

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 29 Nov 1978
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: For charts of patients seen prior to 2013, and any third party reports irrespective of when the patient was seen, requests must be emailed to: [email protected] The request should include their contact info, and reference Account # KTB020997. For charts only, patients from 2013 onwards may contact Trillium Health Partners at 905-848-7181 or send an email to [email protected].
Date Received: 19 Aug 2020

Instructions/Address: Patients prior to 2013 must email a request to: [email protected]
The request should include their contact info, and reference Account # KTB020997.

Patients from 2013 onwards may contact Trillium Health Partners at 905-848-7181 or send an email to [email protected].
Date Received: 14 Apr 2020

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1974

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 03 Jun 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 1976
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1974
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 2022


DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Feb 1976

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1974