THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:14:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Haiti, 1962
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Nov 1970
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 30 1970
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Haiti, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Nov 1970
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 30 1970
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Haiti, 1962

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jan 2025
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Apr 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Specified Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 02 Aug 1972
First certificate of registration issued: Institutional - Public Service, Federal Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1971
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2025

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Feb 1976

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 May 1975

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Apr 1974

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Specified Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Aug 1973

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 1972

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Institutional - Public Service, Federal Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 1971