THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 04:58:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1969
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michaels Hospital
Neurosurgical Clinic
3rd Floor, Donnelly Wing South
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 258-8959
Fax: (416) 924-2744

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 17 Nov 1975
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1975
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul Muller Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Muller (CPSO#: 28077 )
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 258-8959

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michaels Hospital
Neurosurgical Clinic
3rd Floor, Donnelly Wing South
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 258-8959
Fax: (416) 924-2744

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 17 Nov 1975
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1975
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul Muller Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Muller (CPSO#: 28077 )
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 258-8959

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL JULIUS MULLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MULLER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL JULIUS MULLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MULLER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1969

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 22 Aug 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 1976
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1969
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 1982

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 1977

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 1976

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 1969