THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:40:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1974
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 16 Nov 1979
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical records can submit a written request to [email protected]
Date Received: 16 Mar 2017

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 16 Nov 1979
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical records can submit a written request to [email protected]
Date Received: 16 Mar 2017

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER HERBERT CHARLES WATSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WATSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER HERBERT CHARLES WATSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WATSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1974

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 1976
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1974
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 May 1979

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Oct 1977

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 1976

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1974