THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:45:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1975
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, DUTCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
RSRS
111 St Regis Crescent S
Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6

Phone: 1-888-563-3732.
Date Received: 11 Jan 2021

Instructions/Address:
RSRS - Record Storage and Retrieval Service
111 St Regis Crescent S
Toronto, ON
M3J 1Y6
Date Received: 11 Jan 2021

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Thomas Wolder Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, DUTCH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
RSRS
111 St Regis Crescent S
Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6

Phone: 1-888-563-3732.
Date Received: 11 Jan 2021

Instructions/Address:
RSRS - Record Storage and Retrieval Service
111 St Regis Crescent S
Toronto, ON
M3J 1Y6
Date Received: 11 Jan 2021

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Thomas Wolder Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 10 Nov 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 May 1976
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1975
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 10 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 May 1976

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1975