THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:31:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Bristol Medical School, University of Bristol, 1969
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 16 Nov 1977
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1977
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Greece

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Frank C. Smith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Sep 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Bristol Medical School, University of Bristol, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 16 Nov 1977
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1977
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Greece

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Frank C. Smith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Sep 2021

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Bristol Medical School, University of Bristol, 1969

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 21 Jul 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 1976
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 May 1976

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1973