THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:18:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1975
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sinclair Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Mar 2013

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sinclair Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Mar 2013

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 15 Oct 2014
Summary of Decision:
On October 15, 2014, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Sinclair committed an act of professional misconduct in that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practice, that he has committed an act or an omission relevant to the practice medicine that having regard to all the circumstances would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional; and that he has engaged in conduct unbecoming a physician. Dr. Sinclair admitted to the allegations.

Criminal Charges under the Controlled Drug and Substances Act and the Criminal Code On June 20, 2008, Dr. Sinclair was charged with 5 counts of possession of controlled substances for the purposes of trafficking contrary to section 5(2) of the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act. The controlled substances were prescription narcotics including oxycodone and hydromorphone.

On January 22, 2008 Dr. Sinclair was charged in an 89 count indictment under the Criminal Code alleging 52 counts of fraud and 37 counts of drawing a document without authority. The allegations related to issuing prescriptions for narcotics for patients who did not receive the prescription and for billing insurers and the Ministry of Health and Long Term Care (MOHLTC) for such prescriptions.

Criminal Proceedings and Admissions in the Superior Court of Justice

In the criminal proceedings, which took place between 2011 and 2012, Dr. Sinclair admitted that he committed the offences for which he was charged.

With respect to the Trafficking Offences, the admitted facts establish, among other things, that:

(a) On June 19, 2008, Dr. Sinclair had in his medical office 14,092 tablets of controlled drugs (oxycodone and hydromorphone) with a street value of $462,880.00. The controlled substances were not required for Dr. Sinclair's medical practice and were in his possession contrary to the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act; and,

(b) On June 19, 2008, Dr. Sinclair had in his home: (i) cash exceeding $400,000.00 CAD (the total Canadian funds found in his basement was $50,470.00 and the total of U.S. funds found in the basement was $366,560.00); and, (ii) sports memorabilia with an estimated value of $500,000.00.

With respect to the Fraud Offences, the admitted facts establish, among other things, that:

(a) Between January 2005 and April 2008, Dr. Sinclair prepared prescriptions for narcotics for 37 of his patients and presented the prescriptions to a pharmacy in Ontario. Dr. Sinclair had included notations on some of these prescriptions;

(b) In each case, the patient named in the prescription was not actually seen by Dr. Sinclair in the period in question. The prescriptions written for those patients were later filled by a person other than the named patient at the pharmacy, and the named patient did not receive the prescribed drugs.

(c) In the ordinary course, Dr. Sinclair's patients received drug benefits from services such as Green Shield, Assure, Blue Cross and the MOHTLC. The insurers and/or the MOHLTC paid monies to either or both the patients named in the prescription or the pharmacy issuing the prescription. Both the insurers and the MOHLTC paid the monies believing the prescription for narcotics written by Dr. Sinclair for his patients were legitimate. Neither the insurers nor MOHLTC would have paid any amount had they known the prescriptions for narcotics were drawn without proper authority.

(d) The following entities were defrauded:

Greenshield: $145,951.70
Ministry of Health and Long Term Care: $ 62,381.00
Assure: $ 4,163.00
Ontario Blue Cross: $ 10.90

Dr. Sinclair acknowledged his admissions in the criminal proceeding, and his admission in the criminal proceeding that he committed the offences for which he was charged, and adopted these admissions in relation to the Discipline Committee proceeding.

Criminal Convictions and Findings of Guilt

Dr. Sinclair was convicted of the following:

(a) 5 counts of possessing a substance included in Schedule I of the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act for the purposes of trafficking;
(b) 25 counts of fraud over $5000 contrary to section 380(1) of the Criminal Code;
(c) 27 counts of fraud under $5000 contrary to section 380(1) of the Criminal Code (4 counts of which were subsequently withdrawn);
(d) 37 counts of drawing a document without authority contrary to section 374(a) of the Criminal Code, (the conviction of which was stayed).

On February 8, 2013, Dr. Sinclair was sentenced to:

(a) a period of jail for five years;
(b) a restitution order in favour of:
(a) Greenshield in the amount of $145,951.70
(b) The Ministry of Health and Long Term Care $62,819.20
(c) Assure $4,163.39
(d) Ontario Blue Cross $10.90

Dr. Sinclair's certificate of registration expired on August 15, 2013.

The Committee ordered and directed that:

the Registrar revoke Dr. Sinclair's certificate of registration as of the date of this Order Dr. Sinclair appear before the panel to be reprimanded on a date to be scheduled within three months of this Order becoming final
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): October 15, 2014

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 15 Oct 2014
Summary of Decision:
On October 15, 2014, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Sinclair committed an act of professional misconduct in that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practice, that he has committed an act or an omission relevant to the practice medicine that having regard to all the circumstances would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional; and that he has engaged in conduct unbecoming a physician. Dr. Sinclair admitted to the allegations.

Criminal Charges under the Controlled Drug and Substances Act and the Criminal Code On June 20, 2008, Dr. Sinclair was charged with 5 counts of possession of controlled substances for the purposes of trafficking contrary to section 5(2) of the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act. The controlled substances were prescription narcotics including oxycodone and hydromorphone.

On January 22, 2008 Dr. Sinclair was charged in an 89 count indictment under the Criminal Code alleging 52 counts of fraud and 37 counts of drawing a document without authority. The allegations related to issuing prescriptions for narcotics for patients who did not receive the prescription and for billing insurers and the Ministry of Health and Long Term Care (MOHLTC) for such prescriptions.

Criminal Proceedings and Admissions in the Superior Court of Justice

In the criminal proceedings, which took place between 2011 and 2012, Dr. Sinclair admitted that he committed the offences for which he was charged.

With respect to the Trafficking Offences, the admitted facts establish, among other things, that:

(a) On June 19, 2008, Dr. Sinclair had in his medical office 14,092 tablets of controlled drugs (oxycodone and hydromorphone) with a street value of $462,880.00. The controlled substances were not required for Dr. Sinclair's medical practice and were in his possession contrary to the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act; and,

(b) On June 19, 2008, Dr. Sinclair had in his home: (i) cash exceeding $400,000.00 CAD (the total Canadian funds found in his basement was $50,470.00 and the total of U.S. funds found in the basement was $366,560.00); and, (ii) sports memorabilia with an estimated value of $500,000.00.

With respect to the Fraud Offences, the admitted facts establish, among other things, that:

(a) Between January 2005 and April 2008, Dr. Sinclair prepared prescriptions for narcotics for 37 of his patients and presented the prescriptions to a pharmacy in Ontario. Dr. Sinclair had included notations on some of these prescriptions;

(b) In each case, the patient named in the prescription was not actually seen by Dr. Sinclair in the period in question. The prescriptions written for those patients were later filled by a person other than the named patient at the pharmacy, and the named patient did not receive the prescribed drugs.

(c) In the ordinary course, Dr. Sinclair's patients received drug benefits from services such as Green Shield, Assure, Blue Cross and the MOHTLC. The insurers and/or the MOHLTC paid monies to either or both the patients named in the prescription or the pharmacy issuing the prescription. Both the insurers and the MOHLTC paid the monies believing the prescription for narcotics written by Dr. Sinclair for his patients were legitimate. Neither the insurers nor MOHLTC would have paid any amount had they known the prescriptions for narcotics were drawn without proper authority.

(d) The following entities were defrauded:

Greenshield: $145,951.70
Ministry of Health and Long Term Care: $ 62,381.00
Assure: $ 4,163.00
Ontario Blue Cross: $ 10.90

Dr. Sinclair acknowledged his admissions in the criminal proceeding, and his admission in the criminal proceeding that he committed the offences for which he was charged, and adopted these admissions in relation to the Discipline Committee proceeding.

Criminal Convictions and Findings of Guilt

Dr. Sinclair was convicted of the following:

(a) 5 counts of possessing a substance included in Schedule I of the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act for the purposes of trafficking;
(b) 25 counts of fraud over $5000 contrary to section 380(1) of the Criminal Code;
(c) 27 counts of fraud under $5000 contrary to section 380(1) of the Criminal Code (4 counts of which were subsequently withdrawn);
(d) 37 counts of drawing a document without authority contrary to section 374(a) of the Criminal Code, (the conviction of which was stayed).

On February 8, 2013, Dr. Sinclair was sentenced to:

(a) a period of jail for five years;
(b) a restitution order in favour of:
(a) Greenshield in the amount of $145,951.70
(b) The Ministry of Health and Long Term Care $62,819.20
(c) Assure $4,163.39
(d) Ontario Blue Cross $10.90

Dr. Sinclair's certificate of registration expired on August 15, 2013.

The Committee ordered and directed that:

the Registrar revoke Dr. Sinclair's certificate of registration as of the date of this Order Dr. Sinclair appear before the panel to be reprimanded on a date to be scheduled within three months of this Order becoming final
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): October 15, 2014

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 15 Oct 2014
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 15 Aug 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1976
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1975
DETAILS: Revoked: Discipline Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Oct 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1976

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1975