THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:56:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1975
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 209-460 Springbank Drive
London Ontario N6J0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 659 2002
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Nov 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 209-460 Springbank Drive
London Ontario N6J0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 659 2002
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Nov 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTINE GERBIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GERBIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTINE GERBIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GERBIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2002
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 25 Jul 1978
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1976
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 1978

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 1976