THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:33:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1975
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services
Tel: 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 20 Dec 2016

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.P. Leung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Jan 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services
Tel: 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 20 Dec 2016

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.P. Leung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Jan 2022

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 27 Nov 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1976
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1975
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 27 Nov 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 1976

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1975