THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:44:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1975
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Halton Hills Family Health
171 Guelph St
Georgetown ON L7G 4A1
Date Received: 03 Dec 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Bourns Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 May 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Halton Hills Family Health
171 Guelph St
Georgetown ON L7G 4A1
Date Received: 03 Dec 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Bourns Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 May 2019

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1975
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
No information available

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jan 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1976
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 1976

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1975