THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:48:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1975
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may send a request by email to: [email protected].
Date Received: 26 Jun 2023

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may send a request by email to: [email protected].
Date Received: 26 Jun 2023

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Effective Date: 27 Jun 2023
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Eric John Ireland to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 27, 2023:
 
Dr. Ireland has resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.


Source: Member
Effective Date: 31 Aug 2022
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Eric John Ireland to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 31, 2022:
 
Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Ireland’s knowledge, skill and judgment. As a result:
 
Dr. Ireland will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6 months.
 
Dr. Ireland will engage in professional education in medical recordkeeping and certain clinical issues.
 
Dr. Ireland’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College approximately 6 months following the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Effective Date: 27 Jun 2023
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Eric John Ireland to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 27, 2023:
 
Dr. Ireland has resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.


Source: Member
Effective Date: 31 Aug 2022
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Eric John Ireland to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 31, 2022:
 
Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Ireland’s knowledge, skill and judgment. As a result:
 
Dr. Ireland will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6 months.
 
Dr. Ireland will engage in professional education in medical recordkeeping and certain clinical issues.
 
Dr. Ireland’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College approximately 6 months following the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 27 Jun 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 09 Apr 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2012
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 07 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 1999
Terms and conditions amended by Executive Committee. Effective: 12 Nov 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1976
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 09 Apr 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Apr 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jan 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 29 Jan 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Dec 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 07 Sep 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 1999

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Executive Committee.
Date: Effective: 12 Nov 1996

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Feb 1981
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 27 Feb 1981

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 1976

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1976

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1975