THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:31:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Irish Conjoint Board, 1972
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1977
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1977
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: -For patients that saw Dr. Black at 528 College Street, Toronto, ON, M6G 1A6, contact Records Storage and Retrieval Services at 111 St. Regis Crescent South, Toronto, ON, M3J 1Y6, 1-888-563-3732 (phone), 416-398-5932 (fax), www.recordsolution.ca.
-For patients that saw Dr. Black at the Queen West Community Health Centre, at 168 Bathurst Street, Toronto, ON, M5V 2R4, 416-703-8480 (phone), contact the health centre directly.
Date Received: 21 Jul 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. William Black Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Nov 2013

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Irish Conjoint Board, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1977
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1977
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: -For patients that saw Dr. Black at 528 College Street, Toronto, ON, M6G 1A6, contact Records Storage and Retrieval Services at 111 St. Regis Crescent South, Toronto, ON, M3J 1Y6, 1-888-563-3732 (phone), 416-398-5932 (fax), www.recordsolution.ca.
-For patients that saw Dr. Black at the Queen West Community Health Centre, at 168 Bathurst Street, Toronto, ON, M5V 2R4, 416-703-8480 (phone), contact the health centre directly.
Date Received: 21 Jul 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. William Black Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Nov 2013

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Irish Conjoint Board, 1972

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 19 Jul 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Dec 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1973
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1972

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Nov 1982

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 1982

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Aug 1976

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Dec 1974

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 1973

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 1972