THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 05:09:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1975
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, YIDDISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 01 Dec 1981
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 12 Nov 1979
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 12 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Records Management Ltd.
Unit 13
1 High Meadow Place
Toronto, ON M9L 0A3
Tel: 1 800 775 0093
Date Received: 28 Jul 2015

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.N. Druck Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Feb 2022

Corporation Name: Maurice Druck Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 May 2016

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, YIDDISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 01 Dec 1981
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 12 Nov 1979
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 12 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Records Management Ltd.
Unit 13
1 High Meadow Place
Toronto, ON M9L 0A3
Tel: 1 800 775 0093
Date Received: 28 Jul 2015

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.N. Druck Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Feb 2022

Corporation Name: Maurice Druck Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 May 2016

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Member Deceased Effective: 14 Oct 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1976
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
DETAILS: Expired: Member Deceased
Date: Effective: 14 Oct 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Aug 1976

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1975