THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:14:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Aberdeen School of Medicine, Medical Sciences and Nutrition, 1963
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI
Medical School: University of Aberdeen School of Medicine, Medical Sciences and Nutrition, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 22 Feb 2005
Summary of Decision:
On February 22, 2005, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Lad committed an act of professional misconduct under paragraph 1(1)33, of Ontario Regulation No. 856/93, made under the Medicine Act, 1991, in that he has engaged in conduct or an act relevent to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional (rude, inappropriate and abusive statements he made to a minor patient).

Therefore the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1. The Registrar suspend Dr. Mohanlal Bhulabhai Lad’s Certificate of Registration for a period of two months, commencing on March 1, 2005.

2. The Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Mohanlal Bhulabhai Lad’s Certificate of Registration:

(a) Dr. Lad is required to successfully complete, at his own expense, within six months of the finding of professional misconduct:

(i) the College’s course “Physician–Patient Communication and Interviewing Skills”; and
(ii) the College’s course “Medical Ethics”.

3. Dr. Mohanlal Bhulabhai Lad attend before the Discipline Committee to be reprimanded and that the fact of the reprimand be recorded on the Public Register.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Feb 22, 2005

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 22 Feb 2005
Summary of Decision:
On February 22, 2005, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Lad committed an act of professional misconduct under paragraph 1(1)33, of Ontario Regulation No. 856/93, made under the Medicine Act, 1991, in that he has engaged in conduct or an act relevent to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional (rude, inappropriate and abusive statements he made to a minor patient).

Therefore the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1. The Registrar suspend Dr. Mohanlal Bhulabhai Lad’s Certificate of Registration for a period of two months, commencing on March 1, 2005.

2. The Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Mohanlal Bhulabhai Lad’s Certificate of Registration:

(a) Dr. Lad is required to successfully complete, at his own expense, within six months of the finding of professional misconduct:

(i) the College’s course “Physician–Patient Communication and Interviewing Skills”; and
(ii) the College’s course “Medical Ethics”.

3. Dr. Mohanlal Bhulabhai Lad attend before the Discipline Committee to be reprimanded and that the fact of the reprimand be recorded on the Public Register.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Feb 22, 2005

Training

Medical School: University of Aberdeen School of Medicine, Medical Sciences and Nutrition, 1963

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 29 Nov 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 2005
Suspension of registration removed. Effective: 01 May 2005
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Mar 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1976
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1973
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 29 Nov 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 May 2005

DETAILS: Suspension of registration removed.
Date: Effective: 01 May 2005

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2005

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Feb 2005
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Feb 2005

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 1976

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 1973