THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:04:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, Dentistry and Nursing, 1972
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 400 Broad Street West
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital
Medicine
Dunnville Ontario N1A 2P7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 774 7431
Extension: 1219
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 15 Nov 1978
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Requests for medical records can be forwarded to Dr. Kean via email: [email protected] or by contacting Clinical Records Department Haldimand War Memorial Hospital at Tel (905) 774-7431 – ext Registration (Cathy and Team) or ext Clinical Records.
Date Received: 16 Dec 2022

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Haldimand War Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Dunnville

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, Dentistry and Nursing, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 400 Broad Street West
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital
Medicine
Dunnville Ontario N1A 2P7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 774 7431
Extension: 1219
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 15 Nov 1978
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Requests for medical records can be forwarded to Dr. Kean via email: [email protected] or by contacting Clinical Records Department Haldimand War Memorial Hospital at Tel (905) 774-7431 – ext Registration (Cathy and Team) or ext Clinical Records.
Date Received: 16 Dec 2022

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Haldimand War Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Dunnville

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WALTER FAIRBAIRN KEAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WALTER FAIRBAIRN KEAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, Dentistry and Nursing, 1972

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 1976
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1975
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Oct 1976

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 1975