THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 19:29:10 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Dublin, 1973
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Fanshawe College Student Health Services
1001 Fanshawe College Boulevard
London Ontario N5Y 5R6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 452 4230
Fax: 519 452 4415

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 13 Nov 1978
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 13 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.H.Chamberlaine Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Chamberlaine (CPSO#: 28959 )
Business Address: University of Western Ontario
University Community Centre
Student Health Services
Suite 11
London Ontario N6A 3K7
(519) 661-3030

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Dublin, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Fanshawe College Student Health Services
1001 Fanshawe College Boulevard
London Ontario N5Y 5R6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 452 4230
Fax: 519 452 4415

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 13 Nov 1978
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 13 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.H.Chamberlaine Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Chamberlaine (CPSO#: 28959 )
Business Address: University of Western Ontario
University Community Centre
Student Health Services
Suite 11
London Ontario N6A 3K7
(519) 661-3030

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHARLES HENRY CHAMBERLAINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAMBERLAINE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHARLES HENRY CHAMBERLAINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAMBERLAINE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Dublin, 1973

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 1977
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Feb 1977

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1974