THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:08:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1975
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1980
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1980
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 05 Dec 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1976
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2009

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 05 Dec 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Apr 2007
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Executive Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Apr 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 1977

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 1977

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1976

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1975