THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:34:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1975
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Suite 300
581 Argus Road
Oakville ON L6J 3J3
Date Received: 30 May 2016

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Keeton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Aug 2016

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Suite 300
581 Argus Road
Oakville ON L6J 3J3
Date Received: 30 May 2016

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Keeton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Aug 2016

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 30 May 2016
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Michael Keeton to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective Mary 30, 2016:


Dr. Keeton was the subject of a College investigation into whether he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and/or was incompetent in his practice. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Keeton resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 30 May 2016
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Michael Keeton to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective Mary 30, 2016:


Dr. Keeton was the subject of a College investigation into whether he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and/or was incompetent in his practice. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Keeton resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 1977
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Mar 1977

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1975