THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 03:41:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1975
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 80 North Queen Street
Toronto Ontario M8Z 2C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-233-1015
Fax: 416-233-1035

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 07 Dec 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1980
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Leslie M. Goldenberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 May 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 80 North Queen Street
Toronto Ontario M8Z 2C9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-233-1015
Fax: 416-233-1035

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 07 Dec 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1980
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Leslie M. Goldenberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 May 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LESLIE MARK COOPER GOLDENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDENBERG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LESLIE MARK COOPER GOLDENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDENBERG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 1977
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1975
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Mar 1977

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1975