THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:21:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1975
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 102-745 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge ON N1R 0B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 51927459754
Fax: 2266668966

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1983
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking access to their medical record can contact: Southwest Ontario Aboriginal Health Centre, 425-427 William Street, London ON N6B 3E1, Tel: 519-672-4079.
Date Received: 26 Nov 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Philip C. McCabe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 May 2020

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 102-745 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge ON N1R 0B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 51927459754
Fax: 2266668966

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1983
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking access to their medical record can contact: Southwest Ontario Aboriginal Health Centre, 425-427 William Street, London ON N6B 3E1, Tel: 519-672-4079.
Date Received: 26 Nov 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Philip C. McCabe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 May 2020

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PHILIP CHARLES MCCABE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCABE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PHILIP CHARLES MCCABE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCABE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2021
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jan 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1976
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Dec 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2020


DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Mar 1977

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Oct 1976

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1976

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1975