THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:02:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1975
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St. Regis Crescent South
North York, ON M3J 1Y6
Date Received: 14 May 2020

Instructions/Address: Effective February 28, 2018: Patients requesting a copy of their medical records should contact the above.
Record Storage & Retrieval Services
T: 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 26 Jan 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark Wise Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Dec 2020

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St. Regis Crescent South
North York, ON M3J 1Y6
Date Received: 14 May 2020

Instructions/Address: Effective February 28, 2018: Patients requesting a copy of their medical records should contact the above.
Record Storage & Retrieval Services
T: 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 26 Jan 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark Wise Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Dec 2020

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Apr 1977
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1975
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020


DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Apr 1977

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1975