THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 04:30:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of London, 1969
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Western Hospital
East Wing
7-449
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 603-5177
Fax: (416) 603-6763
Address: St Michael's Hospital
Occupational Medicine Clinic
St. Michael's Hospital Unity Health
36 Toronto St. Ste 700, ON M5C 2C5
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5074
Fax: 416 864-5421

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 25 Nov 1976
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 04 Nov 1975
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 1976
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 04 1975
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of London, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Western Hospital
East Wing
7-449
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 603-5177
Fax: (416) 603-6763
Address: St Michael's Hospital
Occupational Medicine Clinic
St. Michael's Hospital Unity Health
36 Toronto St. Ste 700, ON M5C 2C5
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5074
Fax: 416 864-5421

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 25 Nov 1976
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 04 Nov 1975
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 1976
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 04 1975
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUSAN MARY TARLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TARLO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUSAN MARY TARLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TARLO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of London, 1969

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1977
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 1977