THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 03:49:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1976
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Danforth Medical Centre
1473 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4J 1N5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 461-0785
Fax: (416) 461-0787
Address: 2754 Victoria Park Avenue
North York Ontario M2J 4A8
Phone: (416) 491-3910
Fax: (416) 491-3919

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Ciurria Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Oct 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Danforth Medical Centre
1473 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4J 1N5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 461-0785
Fax: (416) 461-0787
Address: 2754 Victoria Park Avenue
North York Ontario M2J 4A8
Phone: (416) 491-3910
Fax: (416) 491-3919

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Ciurria Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Oct 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICHOLAS SAMUEL CIURRIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CIURRIA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICHOLAS SAMUEL CIURRIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CIURRIA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 06 Apr 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1977
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1976
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 06 Apr 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Sep 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 06 Sep 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1977

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1976